JERUSALEM A CHURCH WITHOUT WALLS UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Giving free advice to broken families, youth work by assisting with finding jobs, creating CV's, talks on drugs and violence feeding the homeless within the local community and outer areas. Reaching out to stores to assist with feeding the homeless, having meetings to assist the homeless with claiming benefits and getting supportive housing. Assisting the elderly throughout COVID-19
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 20 May 2022
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 09 July 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michelle Shaw | Chair | 03 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Ferguson | Trustee | 30 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sabrina Green-Davis | Trustee | 03 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Valriea Johnson | Trustee | 03 June 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 20/05/2021 | 20/05/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £200 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 20 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 48 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 48 days | |
Annual return | 20 May 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 413 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 May 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 413 days | |
Annual return | 20 May 2022 | 12 May 2023 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 May 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 779 days | |
Annual return | 20 May 2021 | 22 March 2023 | 367 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 20 May 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1144 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 09 Jul 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO(JERUSALEM A CHURCH WITHOUT WALLS UK) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH THROUGHOUT THE UK FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF WORSHIP, PRAYER MEETINGS, RELIGIOUS EDUCATION, PUBLIC CELEBRATIONS OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS, INTERFAITH ACTIVITIES, PASTORAL CARE AND OUTREACH WORK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Apartment 71
Woodall Court
7 Whitestone Way
CROYDON
CR0 4WG
- Phone:
- 02086867414
- Email:
- admin@jerusalemacww.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window