The Caledonia Investments Charitable Foundation

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects are to provide grants: a. to eligible applicants in significant financial hardship as a consequence of the Covid-19 pandemic including current and recent former employees, their immediate families or dependents, or other individuals closely connected with Caledonia Investments plc; and b. to other charities and charitable causes as considered appropriate by the Trustees.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- China
- Germany
- Guernsey
- India
- Jersey
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
- United States
Governance
- 28 July 2020: Standard registration
- THE CALEDONIA FUND (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JAMES MICHAEL BEALE CAYZER-COLVIN | Chair | 01 June 2020 |
|
|||||
SOPHIE HELEN BELL | Trustee | 12 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
STEPHANIE HILLARY BECKFORD | Trustee | 12 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
BENEDICT JOHN PATRICK ARCHER | Trustee | 12 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amy Margaret McNeill | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
ALEXANDER JAMES FRANKLIN WILDMAN | Trustee | 01 June 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £490.81k | £290.00k | £310.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £447.03k | £326.86k | £305.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 02 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 01 JUN 2020 as amended on 06 Jan 2021
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL PAY OR APPLY THE INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND AND MAY ALSO TRANSFER PAY OR APPLY THE WHOLE OR ANY PART OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL OF THE TRUST FUND TO SUCH MEMBERS OF THE CALEDONIA CLASS OR SUCH CHARITIES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR ABSOLUTE AND UNCONTROLLED DISCRETION THINK FIT FOR THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND POVERTY AMONG THE MEMBERS OF THE CALEDONIA CLASS CAUSED BY THE COVID-19 PANDEMIC OR FOR ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Caledonia Investments Plc
CAYZER HOUSE
30 Buckingham Gate
LONDON
SW1E 6NN
- Phone:
- 02078028080
- Email:
- enquiries@caledonia.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window