THE RAFT FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Raft Foundation is a crisis support foodbank providing individuals and families in Rossendale: - parcels of food for 3 meals a day x 7 days per person - essential household goods, e.g. nappies, toiletries - signposting to support with their causes of poverty We deliver 3 days per week, every week, with the other days spent sourcing, collecting, sorting and packing donated food.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
Total income includes £50,000 from 2 government contract(s) and £50,000 from 2 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
24 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lancashire
Governance
- 14 September 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Janice Beverley Johnson | Chair | 14 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Hall | Trustee | 13 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Heaton | Trustee | 13 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Paul Heaton | Trustee | 13 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Subasic | Trustee | 13 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark John Stapleton | Trustee | 14 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gerard Francis Greenhalgh | Trustee | 14 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £104.05k | £106.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.85k | £58.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £47.94k | £50.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.00k | £50.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 198 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 198 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 19 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 14 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONGST PEOPLE IN ROSSENDALE AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS: A)PROVIDING EMERGENCY FOOD, ESSENTIAL TOILETRIES, HOUSEHOLD ITEMS AND OTHER ITEMS GIFTED TO THE ORGANISATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF INDIVIDUALS AND FAMILIES IN NEED B)SUCH OTHER MEANS, INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO)THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT OR SIGNPOSTING TO RELEVANT INFORMATION AND OTHER ADVISORY SERVICES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
195A Bury Road
Rawtenstall
ROSSENDALE
Lancashire
BB4 6DJ
- Phone:
- 07874206854
- Email:
- info@raftfoundation.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window