Accounts and annual returns AL MIFTAH

Charity number: 1191922
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 30 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 30 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 17 February 2024 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 17 February 2024 17 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 03 May 2023 92 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 04 May 2023 93 days late Download Open in new window