ORPINGTON FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Football Club
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bromley
- Kent
Governance
- 27 April 2020: Standard registration
- ORPINGTON FC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Kettle | Trustee | 13 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Ingram | Trustee | 10 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Simon Morris | Trustee | 10 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
JULIE ANN COVILL | Trustee | 10 July 2020 |
|
|||||
Thomas Shrubshall | Trustee | 10 July 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £280.01k | £217.00k | £166.70k | £167.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £143.02k | £192.54k | £147.78k | £149.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 07 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 07 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 20 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 20 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 16 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 16 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23 APR 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF ORPINGTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PLAYING ASSOCIATION FOOTBALL. TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF ORPINGTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Willow Vale
Chislehurst
BR7 5DF
- Phone:
- 02084673060
- Email:
- orpingtonfc@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window