ST AIDAN'S JUNIOR COMMON ROOM CHARITABLE INCORPORATED ORGANISATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing social, sporting, cultural and recreational activities and forums for discussions and debate for their personal development.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 25 August 2020: CIO registration
- ST AIDAN'S JCR (Working name)
- ST AIDAN'S JCR CIO (Working name)
- ST AIDAN'S JCR CHARITABLE INCORPORATED ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Eileen Maria Mortby | Chair | 26 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Martha Deyermond | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Kelly | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Severino Bonvini | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Rouse | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Edward Smith | Trustee | 22 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Martyn Richards | Trustee | 26 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Glenn Anthony Jackson | Trustee | 26 August 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/09/2021 | 01/09/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £295.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £163.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 30 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 30 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 September 2022 | 30 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2022 | 30 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 September 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 25 Aug 2020 as amended on 02 Dec 2020 as amended on 24 Mar 2022 as amended on 24 Mar 2022 as amended on 24 Mar 2022 as amended on 26 Jan 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF STUDENTS AT ST AIDAN’S COLLEGE, DURHAM UNIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: 3.1 PROMOTING THE INTERESTS AND WELFARE OF STUDENTS AT ST AIDAN’S COLLEGE DURING THE COURSE OF STUDY AND REPRESENTING, SUPPORTING AND ADVISING STUDENTS; 3.2 BEING THE RECOGNISED REPRESENTATIVE CHANNEL BETWEEN STUDENTS AND ST AIDAN’S COLLEGE AND ANY OTHER EXTERNAL BODIES; AND 3.3 PROVIDING SOCIAL, SPORTING, CULTURAL AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND FORUMS FOR DISCUSSIONS AND DEBATE FOR THE PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT OF ITS STUDENTS.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Aidans College
Windmill Hill
Durham
DH1 3LJ
- Phone:
- 01913345702
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window