CORNERSTONE CHURCH J30

Charity Number: 1189377
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Sunday 10am Family Church, Sunday 11.30am Communion Service, Tuesday 9.30am Coffee Morning, Wednesday 9.30am Coffee Morning, Wednesday 7.30pm Prayer and Bible Study, Thursday 12 noon Hot Meals for the over sixty, Friday Children's Clubs and Parents, Carer and Tots Groups.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024

Total income: £20,902
Total expenditure: £16,199

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 May 2020: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Simeon Bailie Chair 02 May 2020
None on record
Kevin Ward Trustee 02 May 2020
None on record
Rebekah Bailie Trustee 02 May 2020
None on record
John Fern Trustee 02 May 2020
None on record
Alice Thomas Trustee 02 May 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £10.90k £16.97k £23.78k £20.90k
Total expenditure £7.48k £18.41k £22.34k £16.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2024 15 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2024 15 May 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2023 03 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 03 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 13 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 13 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 23 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 23 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Cornerstone Church
Phoenix House
Redwall Close
Dinnington
S25 3QA
Phone:
07802605890