CHARITY BOOTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
At Charity Boots, we collect unwanted football boots and donate them to children who cannot afford a pair. Football is the most popular sport worldwide, and there are so many children who do not have the same opportunities to safely play the beautiful game. We continuously collaborate with other charities, schools, football clubs etc. so that we can reach the communities that need it the most.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
- Bangladesh
- Colombia
- Congo
- Ghana
- Nigeria
- Taiwan
- Uganda
- Zambia
Governance
- 09 December 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ramanuj Chakrabarti | Trustee | 15 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hardeep Lota | Trustee | 20 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lloyd Salmons | Trustee | 29 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Milo Barnaby Caspar O'Connor BA | Trustee | 29 June 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £3.92k | £2.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £500 | £1.69k | £2.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 09 Dec 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT OR FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF SPORTS, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY PROVIDING SECOND-HAND OR RECYCLED FOOTBALL BOOTS TO CHILDREN WHO OTHERWISE MIGHT LACK THE MEANS TO AFFORD THEM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 St. Georges House
100 Crossbrook Street
WALTHAM CROSS
EN8 8JJ
- Phone:
- 07868848751
- Email:
- neil@charityboots.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window