Accounts and annual returns EMBRACE CHURCH

Charity number: 1190254
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 110 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 110 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 476 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 476 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 04 May 2023 93 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 04 May 2023 93 days late
Annual return 31 March 2021 19 April 2022 78 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 19 April 2022 78 days late