THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF EASTLEIGH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
As part of the Church of England (CoE) the Parish of Eastleigh is here to serve the people of our town. For centuries the CoE has offered help at times of both great celebration and tremendous sadness, as well as in the day-to-day lives we all lead. Even though times are always changing, our faith in the resurrection of Jesus Christ is still the same as it has always been. www/eastleighparish.com
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hampshire
Governance
- 21 May 2020: Standard registration
- ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF EASTLEIGH (Working name)
- PCC OF ALL SAINTS EASTLEIGH (Working name)
- PCC OF E/L (Working name)
- PCC OF EASTLEIGH (Working name)
- PCC OF EASTLEIGH BENEFICE (Working name)
- PCC OF EASTLEIGH PARISH (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Ian Paul Fletcher | Chair | 21 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew William Milligan | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Thomas White | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Kneller | Trustee | 20 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Keith Pickering | Trustee | 20 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Linda Pickering | Trustee | 20 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Susan Elizabeth Fletcher | Trustee | 21 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP GEORGE WATSON | Trustee | 21 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Bronnie Susan Danvers Watson | Trustee | 21 May 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £100.43k | £112.60k | £106.81k | £90.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £83.54k | £85.06k | £74.86k | £79.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 December 2022 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 December 2022 | 37 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 24 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ALL SAINTS CHURCH
DESBOROUGH ROAD
EASTLEIGH
SO50 5NH
- Phone:
- 02380652295
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window