THE PCC OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST ANDREW'S, GIRTON IN THE DIOCESE OF ELY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Girton PCC promotes the mission of the Church of England in the village of Girton by providing public worship and other related activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

15 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 04 May 2020: Standard registration
- 19 March 2021: Funds received from 289839 PARISH CLERK'S CHARITY
- GIRTON PCC (Working name)
- ST ANDREW'S, GIRTON (Working name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Michael David Bigg | Chair | 13 September 2020 |
|
|||||||
Rev Kevin Parks | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|||||||
Mary Brenda Chesterfield | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Caroline Elizabeth Blackmun | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Philip Martin Nuttall | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Terence Frederick Hoad | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Helen Agnes Bannerman Kibble Wilson | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Geoffrey Gordon Burt | Trustee | 14 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Bruce Lawrence William Hunter | Trustee | 30 March 2012 |
|
|||||||
Sheila Joan Hiley | Trustee | 24 May 2004 |
|
|
||||||
Alastair Cyril Lorimer | Trustee | 25 April 2004 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Martyn Alan Johnson | Trustee | 24 April 2004 |
|
|
||||||
Rachel Christina Deacon | Trustee | 05 May 2003 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Margaret Christine Barrow | Trustee | 01 April 2000 |
|
|
||||||
Dugald James Osborne Wilson | Trustee | 17 April 1993 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £57.71k | £99.73k | £100.84k | £168.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £82.37k | £135.13k | £92.87k | £319.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 15 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 13 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH
Contact information
- Address:
-
42 CHURCH LANE
GIRTON
CAMBRIDGE
CB3 0JP
- Phone:
- 01223 202145
- Email:
- rector@girton.church
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window