Vidya Jyoti

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
This charity is engaged in the advancement of education of poor children in rural areas of India. We also provide adolescent girls with hygiene kits and free health assessments where they cannot afford it. In the UK we engage with charities who cater for people with learning disabilities and we support other charitable organisations with donations of food, clothing and children's toys.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Ealing
- India
Governance
- 27 May 2020: CIO registration
- VIDYA JYOTI INDIA (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Pamela Kaushal | Chair | 09 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Parminder Kumar Bajaj ACA | Trustee | 07 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Chander Kishore Kaushal | Trustee | 09 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA BHARDWAJ | Trustee | 09 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
VISHAL BHARDWAJ | Trustee | 09 February 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £67.94k | £128.80k | £130.06k | £99.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.53k | £78.91k | £75.88k | £81.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 03 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 27 May 2020 as amended on 21 Mar 2022 as amended on 03 Jul 2024
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN INDIA AND THE UK, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING SUPPLEMENTARY SCHOOLS OFFERING EDUCATION IN LITERACY, NUMERACY, ENGLISH, HINDI, THE HINDU RELIGION AND SUCH OTHER SUBJECTS OF EDUCATIONAL VALUE AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE AND PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES FOR THE TRAINING AND DEVELOPMENT OF SCHOOL STAFF. 2) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONG DEPRIVED RURAL COMMUNITIES IN INDIA BY PROVIDING VOCATIONAL TRAINING AND ALL THE NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT AND BY PROVIDING ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED. 3) THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH IN DEPRIVED RURAL COMMUNITIES IN INDIA BY PROVIDING HYGIENE PRODUCTS, ACCESS TO REGULAR HEALTH CHECKS FOR CHILDREN WITH SUPPORT FROM PAEDIATRICIANS, OPTOMETRISTS AND DENTISTS AND ACCESS TO APPROPRIATE MEDICAL TREATMENT IN CASES OF SERIOUS ILL HEALTH.
Area of benefit
OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
32 BENNETTS AVENUE
GREENFORD
UB6 8AU
- Phone:
- 07765529399
- Email:
- info@vidya-jyoti.org
- Website:
-
vidya-jyoti.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window