NEW BEGINNINGS CAT RESCUE & REHOMING
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We run a cat rescue & rehoming service in the Newcastle/Gateshead/Tyne and Wear area of NE England. We rescue stray, abandoned, mistreated, unwanted, sick & injured cats & kittens. Prior to rehoming we provide safe, secure accommodation & associated day-to-day care, standard healthcare & ongoing veterinary treatment. For feral cats we operate a humane TNR process (trap, neuter, return/relocate).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Provides Services
- Gateshead
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- Northumberland
Governance
- 30 July 2020: Standard registration
- 15 May 2025: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 15 May 2025: Funds transferred to 1211468 NEW BEGINNINGS CAT RESCUE & REHOMING
- NEW BEGINNINGS CAT REHOMING (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.60k | £57.58k | £81.23k | £114.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.79k | £52.27k | £84.56k | £121.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 APR 2020 as amended on 12 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF ANIMALS, PARTICULARLY CATS, IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND, IN PARTICULAR, TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN RESCUE HOMES OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE, TREATMENT AND REHOMING OF SUCH ANIMALS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window