Accounts and annual returns FISAYO FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1191765
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 14 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 14 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 14 April 2025 349 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 14 April 2025 349 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 14 July 2023 75 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 14 July 2023 75 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 14 July 2023 440 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 14 July 2023 440 days late Download Open in new window