SIFOE DIASPORA ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of those in need, by reason of, age, ill-health, disability, economic or social disadvantage in Sifoe, The Gambia by the provision of grants of financial assistance to provide and maintain essential facilities including but not limited to clean and safe water supplies, drainage, sanitation, energy systems, housing, medical facilities, schools and community facilities with the object of
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- The Gambia
Governance
- 15 December 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lamin Darboe | Chair | 10 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ebrima Camara | Trustee | 10 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
LAMIN JABANG | Trustee | 10 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sally Demba | Trustee | 10 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
KALIFA JABBI | Trustee | 10 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lamin Drammeh | Trustee | 10 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gibril Saine | Trustee | 10 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
ISMAIL COLLEY | Trustee | 10 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
SHERIFFO TABALLY | Trustee | 10 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
LALAMARIAM SAMBOU | Trustee | 10 February 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.41k | £2.00k | £2.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £435 | £526 | £7.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 September 2024 | 228 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 March 2023 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 OCT 2018 AS AMENDED ON 29 NOV 2020 AS AMENDED ON 06 DEC 2020
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, BY REASON OF, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, ECONOMIC OR SOCIAL DISADVANTAGE IN SIFOE, THE GAMBIA BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN ESSENTIAL FACILITIES INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO CLEAN AND SAFE WATER SUPPLIES, DRAINAGE, SANITATION, ENERGY SYSTEMS, HOUSING, MEDICAL FACILITIES, SCHOOLS AND COMMUNITY FACILITIES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS AND/OR PROVIDING ALL THE NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO BE SELF-SUFFICIENT.
Area of benefit
OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 EASEGILL COURT
NOTTINGHAM
NG5 9LU
- Phone:
- 07854799437
- Email:
- Ldrammeh072@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window