GLANWYDDEN & VALLEY COMMUNITY TRUST / YMDDIRIEDOLAETH CYMUNEDOL BRO GLANWYDDEN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust supports the mental & physical wellbeing of community members, vocational and recreational users of the valleys natural environment. Encouraging wildlife education and conservation projects with fellow charitable local partners, social events raising funds for fellow charities and underpinning community growth and cohesion at every step. Communal welfare of humans & environment
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £448 from 2 government grant(s)
People

12 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Conwy
Governance
- 24 August 2020: CIO registration
- CONSTITUTION OF GLANWYDDEN & VALLEY COMMUNITY TRUST / YMDDIRIEDOLAETH CYMUNEDOL BRO GLANWYDDEN (Previous name)
- CONSTITUTION OF GLANWYDDEN & VALLEYCOMMUNITY TRUST / YMDDIRIEDOLAETH CYMUNEDOL BRO GLANWYDDEN (Previous name)
- GLANWYDDEN & VALLEY COMMUNITY TRUST (Previous name)
- GLANWYDDEN & VALLEY COMMUNITY TRUST /YMDDIRIEDLAETH CYMUNEDOL BRO GLANWYDDEN (Previous name)
- THE GLANWYDDEN & VALLEY COMMUNITY TRUST (Previous name)
- THE GLANWYDDEN AND VALLEY COMMUNITY TRUST (Previous name)
- THE GLANWYDDEN VALLEY AREA TRUST (Previous name)
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrea Mary Pardon | Trustee | 14 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Donna Elizabeth Hutton | Trustee | 14 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martyn Bottomley | Trustee | 24 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael Alan Bird | Trustee | 24 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
JOSEPH ANDREW SCARRATT | Trustee | 24 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Felicity Ruth Iliffe | Trustee | 24 August 2020 |
|
|||||
Elan Virginia Louise Rivers | Trustee | 24 August 2020 |
|
|||||
CAROLE BOTTOMLEY | Trustee | 24 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Jones | Trustee | 24 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mary Baillie Pritchard | Trustee | 24 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
LEAH WILLIAMS | Trustee | 24 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Martin Williams | Trustee | 20 August 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.20k | £6.04k | £9.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.99k | £3.86k | £1.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.92k | N/A | £448 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 19 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 Aug 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Tyn y Celyn
Glanwydden
Llandudno Junction
LL31 9JU
- Phone:
- 01492541251
- Email:
- contact@mikebird.info
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window