THE BURY SPEAKEASY CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Speakeasy helps people with aphasia - a communication difficulty caused by stroke or other head injury. We also offer practical help and advice for families and carers of people with aphasia.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £1,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bolton
- Bury
- Lancashire
- Manchester City
Governance
- 03 April 1985: Standard registration
- BURY SPEAKEASY (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID MORTON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Fleur Holland-Haque | Trustee | 02 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jean Wright | Trustee | 21 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Janice Lloyd | Trustee | 22 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Winch | Trustee | 22 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Duncan | Trustee | 22 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Henry Holland | Trustee | 21 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Judith Hancock | Trustee | 12 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Phillip Prince | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Angela Hibbert | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
JOHN LOWE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £111.01k | £163.50k | £105.44k | £94.49k | £201.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £107.37k | £116.87k | £126.32k | £100.89k | £136.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.00k | £10.00k | £2.91k | £5.00k | £1.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 JANUARY 1985 AS AMENDED 24 APRIL 1989
Charitable objects
(A) TO RELIEVE COMFORT AND SUPPORT PERSONS WHO HAVE SUFFERED A STROKE AND AS A RESULT HAS A SPEECH PROBLEM OR HAS ANY OTHER SPEECH PROBLEM; (B) TO PROVIDE OR SECURE THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE TREATMENT AND WELFARE OF SUCH PERSONS; (C) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN PROVIDING IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF SUCH PERSONS WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
BURY METROPOLITAN BOROUGH
Contact information
- Address:
-
Speakeasy
11 Princes Court
Silver Street
Ramsbottom
BURY
BL0 9BJ
- Phone:
- 01706825802
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window