AFRICAN CARIBBEAN MEDICAL MENTORS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
African Caribbean Medical Mentors work to overcome under-representation and disadvantage in Medicine, Dentistry and the healthcare field as a whole and reduce the socio-economic barriers that often affect those of African Caribbean Descent in entering these fields. We address this via mentoring, events, resource provision and grant-making to improve equality in Medicine and Dentistry.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 21 August 2020: CIO registration
- ACMM (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Shikila Edward | Chair | 21 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Omolara Akinnanonu | Trustee | 01 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Monique Wheatle | Trustee | 01 August 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.34k | £1.84k | £287 | £41 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.02k | £3.06k | £1.12k | £189 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 21 Aug 2020
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY SEEKING TO ADDRESS THE UNDERREPRESENTATION OF STUDENTS OF AFRICAN CARIBBEAN DESCENT STUDYING MEDICINE AND DENTISTRY AT UNIVERSITIES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND WORKING AS PROFESSIONALS IN THE FIELDS OF MEDICINE AND DENTISTRY AS A WHOLE AND TO REDUCE THE SOCIO-ECONOMIC BARRIERS THAT OFTEN AFFECT PEOPLE OF AFRICAN CARIBBEAN DESCENT IN ENTERING THOSE PROFESSIONS, IN PARTICULAR AFRICAN CARIBBEAN MEDICAL MENTORS WILL SEEK TO: · INCREASE THE NUMBER OF PEOPLE OF AFRICAN CARIBBEAN DESCENT STUDYING AND PRACTICING MEDICINE AND DENTISTRY; · IMPROVE THEIR LIKELIHOOD OF SUCCESS IN APPLICATIONS TO MEDICAL AND DENTAL SCHOOL; · PROVIDE A NETWORK FOR COMMUNICATION, SUPPORT, ASSISTANCE AND EMPOWERMENT OF PEOPLE OF AFRICAN CARIBBEAN DESCENT IN THE FIELDS OF MEDICINE AND DENTISTRY. WITH THE AIM OF CREATING A MORE DIVERSE AND REPRESENTATIVE HEALTHCARE SYSTEM WHICH REFLECTS SOCIETY AS A WHOLE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ACMM
61 Bridge Street
KINGTON
Herefordshire
HR5 3DJ
- Phone:
- 07880347923
- Email:
- info@acmedicalmentors.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window