LEEDS CHINESE COMMUNITY SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides out-of-school-hours activities for school age children, e.g. Chinese Language lessons (both Mandarin and Cantonese), Chinese Dance, Calligraphy, Crafts, etc, in Leeds and Districts. We also provide Chinese language lessons for adults and promote Chinese culture amongst local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income includes £2,000 from 3 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Bradford City
- Calderdale
- City Of Wakefield
- Kirklees
- Leeds City
Governance
- 18 February 1985: Standard registration
- LEEDS AND DISTRICT CHINESE COMMUNITY WORD UNDERSTANDING CLASS (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr YI LING CHAN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Cheng Cheong Choy | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Yue Huang | Trustee | 17 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kayan Tsang | Trustee | 06 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Kit | Trustee | 10 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Lam | Trustee | 17 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Cheng | Trustee | 17 May 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £58.61k | £27.35k | £43.29k | £37.88k | £77.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £43.36k | £25.65k | £25.67k | £37.77k | £47.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.02k | £2.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 19 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 19 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 21 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 21 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 21 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 21 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 14 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 14 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 09 July 2021 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 09 July 2021 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 JANUARY 1985 AS AMENDED 18TH MAY 2003.
Charitable objects
(A) THE ADVANCEMENT AND PROMOTION OF EDUCATION IN THE CULTURE, TRADITIONS AND LANGUAGE OF CHINA AMONGST THE PUBLIC, AND IN PARTICULAR CHINESE ADULTS AND CHILDREN RESIDENT IN THE COUNTY OF WEST YORKSHIRE. (B) THE ADVANCEMENT, PROMOTION AND TEACHING OFTHE PUBLIC IN PARTICULAR CHINESE ADULTS AND CHILDREN RESIDENT IN THE SAID AREA. (C) TO PROVIDE RECREATIONAL CHARITIES ACT 1958. (D) TO RELIEVE PERSONS IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
COUNTY OF WEST YORKSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Leeds Chinese Community School
C/o Bishop Young C of E Academy
Bishops Way
Seacroft
Leeds
LS14 6NU
- Phone:
- 07565248392
- Email:
- lccs@gmx.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window