LONDON PRISONS MISSION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve the needs of prisoners and promote the rehabilitation of ex-offenders. Working with people from a range of UK faith communities to facilitate volunteering to assist in prison chaplaincy services in furthering these purposes within prisons or developing an infrastructure which supports those leaving prison so that such people are integrated into society to lead law-abiding lives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
Governance
- 13 November 2020: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Wikner | Trustee | 27 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alasdair Mackenzie | Trustee | 10 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Jane Haydon | Trustee | 10 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Tubbs | Trustee | 10 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Frederic de Sibert | Trustee | 10 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.56k | £9.00k | £575 | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.56k | £18.70k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 25 APR 2020 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 03 NOV 2020
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PRISONERS, AND PROMOTE THE REHABILITATION OF EX-OFFENDERS, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY WORKING WITH PEOPLE FROM A RANGE OF FAITH COMMUNITIES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM TO PROMOTE AND FACILITATE VOLUNTEERING TO ASSIST IN PRISON CHAPLAINCY SERVICES AND OTHER CHARITABLE PROGRAMMES DIRECTED TO FURTHERING THE ABOVE PURPOSES WITHIN PRISONS OR DEVELOPING AND MAINTAINING AN INFRASTRUCTURE WHICH SUPPORTS THOSE LEAVING PRISON SO THAT SUCH PEOPLE ARE INTEGRATED INTO SOCIETY TO LEAD LAW-ABIDING LIVES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
London Prisons Mission
St George's Vestry
2A Mill Street
London
W1S 1FX
- Phone:
- 02072721639
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window