BITTERSUITE EXPERIENCES CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We promote the arts of music through the creation of multi-sensory concerts in both physical and digital spaces. Our multi-sensory concerts, experiences and participation programmes transform the listening experience.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £30,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 01 October 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joshua McNorton | Chair | 20 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Fleur Ker-Reid | Trustee | 06 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ash Patel | Trustee | 06 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Tyrrell | Trustee | 12 March 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £75.45k | £69.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £65.15k | £58.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £30.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 01 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE ARTS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE PROMOTION IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, OF THE ARTS OF MUSIC AND DRAMA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
34 STRATHLEVEN ROAD
LONDON
SW2 5LA
- Phone:
- 07502207092
- Email:
- info@bittersuite.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window