Accounts and annual returns GREATER LONDON HOSPITALITY AND CATERING INDUSTRY ADVICE LINE

Charity number: 1189494
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 Not submitted
Annual return 30 April 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 30 April 2022 02 October 2023 216 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 02 October 2023 216 days late
Annual return 30 April 2021 02 October 2023 581 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 02 October 2023 581 days late