IT TAKES A CITY (CAMBRIDGE)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1) Helping organisations and individuals from across the community to find new ways to eliminate rough sleeping due to homelessness 2) Operating Street Support Cambridgeshire, a mobile friendly website giving information on ways to find help for a rough sleeper and to give help to support organisations 3) Running projects with partners to provide accommodation and support to rough sleepers
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £50,000 from 1 government contract(s) and £125,000 from 5 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 31 July 2020: Standard registration
- IT TAKES A CITY (Working name)
- IT TAKES A CITY - A CAMBRIDGE HOMELESSNESS PARTNERSHIP (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Jenkin | Chair | 11 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Graham Dempsey | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Baxter | Trustee | 05 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Robert Lake | Trustee | 26 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Asha Praseedom | Trustee | 31 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Barry Harwood Read | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Hooton | Trustee | 11 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Simon Allcock | Trustee | 11 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Louise Martinsen-Barker | Trustee | 05 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alison Jane Morris | Trustee | 13 May 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £180.14k | £215.88k | £223.20k | £331.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £145.81k | £202.22k | £223.26k | £312.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £76.38k | N/A | N/A | £50.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | £13.00k | £108.01k | £170.35k | £125.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 14 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12 DEC 2019 as amended on 01 Jul 2024
Charitable objects
4.1. The objects of the Company are to promote for the public benefit the relief of those in need due to their experience of or risk of homelessness in Cambridge and the surrounding areas, in particular but not exclusively by: 4.1.1 providing information on how and where to access services, supporting engagement with service providers, enabling service providers to better meet need, raising awareness and promoting volunteering; 4.1.2 advocating, convening and coordinating the delivery of services; and 4.1.3 advancing any other ancillary charitable purpose in such way as the trustees in their absolute discretion think fit
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/oSt Andrews Street Baptist Church
40- 43 St Andrew's St
Cambridge
CB2 3AR
- Phone:
- 07831547643
- Email:
- itacinfo@ittakesacity.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window