Financial history KETTERING FOODBANK

Charity number: 1189703
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £49.24k £50.21k £101.14k £103.81k £133.66k
Total expenditure £25.32k £26.11k £30.42k £55.08k £75.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £22.45k £3.00k N/A £6.06k £30.00k