CHRIST WINNERS CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 June 2020: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SARAH YEYINU AKLAMAVO | Chair |
|
|
|||||
OLUFEMI TIMEHIN OGUNRO | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STEPHEN AYODEJI OGUNRO | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 169 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 169 days | |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 535 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 535 days | |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 900 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 900 days | |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1265 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1265 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 05 SEP 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHURCH ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO ADVANCE CHRISTIANS FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEF IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME HAS THEY MAY THINK FIT. TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS AND SERVICES OF ANY KIND, INCLUDING THE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TO TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PART OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE TEACHING OF THE CULTURE TO YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE CHURCH. THE TRUSTEES MUST USE THE INCOME AND MAY USE THE CAPITAL OF THE CHURCH IN PROMOTING THE OBJECTIVE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
48 FIELDFARE ROAD
LONDON
SE28 8HR
- Phone:
- 07536200710
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window