ABDUL MAGEED EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Community Learning Workshops, Family Enterprise Days and one to one Information , Advice and Guidance. Abdul Mageed Educational trust is committed to reaching out to African and Arabic speaking hard to reach communities bridging the cultural gap between service users and service providers, breaking barriers and creating a platform for beneficiaries to exchange ideas and expertise.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
- Sudan
Governance
- 16 December 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rajaa Sadig Ahmed Mustafa | Chair | 28 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sanaa Zemrani | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Zakia Zerrouk | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mathew Georghiades | Trustee | 28 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
NAGLAA SADIK AHMED MUSTAFA | Trustee | 28 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sarra Hashim Karrar | Trustee | 28 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Laila Navaid | Trustee | 28 August 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.85k | £19.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.95k | £18.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 109 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 109 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 March 2024 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 March 2024 | 48 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Dec 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (1) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN AFRICAN AND ARAB COMMUNITIES IN THE UK AND IN SUDAN; INCLUDING BY RUNNING OR FACILITATING EDUCATIONAL WORKSHOPS AND BY MAKING GRANTS TO EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS TO SUPPORT ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED STUDENTS; (2) TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF MEMBERS OF THE ARAB AND AFRICAN COMMUNITIES WHO ARE SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED IN THE UK IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET,THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
73C SUTHERLAND STREET
LONDON
SW1V 4JY
- Phone:
- 07309729920
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window