ISLAMIC INFORMATION CENTRE BRISTOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General Community cohesion projects Propagation of Sufi Islam Interfaith projects Teaching of: Arabic language, Islamic education General Islamic information and support Careers Advice support for Refugees & Wider Community Digital Based Arabic Teaching Publication of Islamic literature
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Pakistan
Governance
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Marghoob Ahmad | Chair | 01 January 2015 |
|
|||||
Lubabah Kausar | Trustee | 14 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mujtaba Muhammad | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.00k | £1.78k | £5.80k | £916 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.00k | £8.41k | £11.70k | £2.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | N/A | £5.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 February 2022 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 February 2022 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 14 May 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF ISLAMIC INFORMATION CENTRE BRISTOL ARE: 3.1. TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC RELIGION GENERALLY AND THE PRINCIPLES OF SUFISM IN PARTICULAR AS UNDERSTOOD AND PROMULGATED BY: 3.1.1 HIS SERENE MAJESTY HADRAT SHAIKH ABDAL QADIR JILANI (RADIALLAHU ANHU) 3.1.2 HIS SERENE MAJESTY MUJADID SHAH AHMED RAZA KHAN (RAHIMAHULLAH); 3.1.3 HIS SERENE MAJESTY MUJADID SIRHINDI ALIFTHAANI (RAHIMAHULLAH); 3.1.4 HIS SERENE EXCELLENCY SHAYKH ABDUL HAQ MUHADDITH DEHLVI (RAHIMAHULLAH); 3.1.5 HIS SERENE EXCELLENCY HAZRAT MOHAMMED UMAR SIDDIQI (RAHIMAHULLAH), IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND GLOBALLY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES, PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS, PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON THE ISLAMIC FAITH AND SUFISM IN ORDER TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE ISLAMIC RELIGION AND SUFISM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
460 STAPLETON ROAD
BRISTOL
BS5 6PA
- Phone:
- 01179020037
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window