SPECTRA FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
- Afghanistan
- Bahrain
- Bangladesh
- Burma
- Dubai
- Egypt
- India
- Indonesia
- Israel
- Jordan
- Kosovo
- Kuwait
- Lebanon
- Libya
- Morocco
- Oman
- Pakistan
- Qatar
- Saudi Arabia
- South Sudan
- Sudan
- Syria
- Tunisia
- Turkey
- Yemen
Governance
- 27 October 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Abubakr Siddique | Chair | 27 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMED MOHSIN UDDIN | Trustee | 27 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMAD RASHAD AHMED | Trustee | 27 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.96k | £5.14k | £12.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.96k | £2.43k | £10.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 22 July 2024 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 22 July 2024 | 52 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 02 June 2023 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 02 June 2023 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 25 August 2022 | 86 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 03 October 2022 | 125 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 27 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED ANYWHERE IN THE UK BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, OR SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC DISADVANTAGE IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY PROVIDING FOOD AND MEDICAL PROTECTION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Oak Road
OLDHAM
OL8 3UJ
- Phone:
- 07784384597
- Email:
- info@spectrafoundation.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window