THE NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF WRITERS IN EDUCATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
NAWE's mission is to advocate for Creative Writing: enhancing knowledge and understanding of the subject, supporting writers and good practice in teaching and facilitation in all settings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 16 July 2020: Standard registration
- 05 July 2022: Funds received from 1183627 BRAVE NEW WORDS
- NAWE (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Derek Neale | Chair | 09 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Karina Lickorish Quinn | Trustee | 23 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Yvonne Kim Battle-Felton | Trustee | 16 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jane Elizabeth Moss | Trustee | 16 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jocelyn Page | Trustee | 03 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Joanna Moore | Trustee | 16 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Francis Jonathan Gilbert | Trustee | 16 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Heather Richardson | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Frederick Davidson | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £143.77k | £148.02k | £74.34k | £69.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £112.12k | £125.64k | £126.01k | £57.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12 DEC 2000 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 09 NOV 2019
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE CREATIVE WRITING EDUCATION AT ALL LEVELS, OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL TO BENEFIT FROM PROFESSIONALLY-LED CREATIVE WRITING TEACHING, CREATIVE WRITING RESEARCH AND THE SHARING OF KNOWLEDGE, BEST PRACTICE AND INFORMATION AMONG CREATIVE WRITING EDUCATORS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
TOWER HOUSE
ASKHAM FIELDS LANE
ASKHAM BRYAN
YORK
YO23 3FS
- Phone:
- 03303335909
- Email:
- admin@nawe.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window