JESUS MIRACLE CRUSADE INTERNATIONAL MINISTRY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE ORGANISATION HAS TUESDAY, WEDNESDAY, FRIDAY,SATURDAY AND SUNDAY SERVICES DONE THRU ONLINE SERVICES DUE TO PANDEMIC. EVANGELISATION AND SHARING THE WORD OF GOD ARE DONE THRU ZOOM ONLINE. PRAYING , COUNSELLING AND BAPTISM ARE DONE THRU ONLINE AS WELL.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 07 August 2020: CIO registration
- JMCIM (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Minister Wilde James Comon Almeda | Chair | 05 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Richard Leonardo Ancheta Ortilano | Trustee | 05 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Julie Castro Gutierrez | Trustee | 05 December 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/03/2021 | 30/03/2022 | 30/03/2023 | 30/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.82k | £12.50k | £12.60k | £22.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.97k | £9.00k | £12.00k | £22.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 07 Aug 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH, IN LONDON AND SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
574 WHITTON AVENUE WEST
GREENFORD
UB6 0EF
- Phone:
- 07832353537
- Email:
- jmcimlondon.uk@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
jmcimuk.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window