HUNTINGTON DISEASE LIVIN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
As a recently established charity we are raising funds to create purpose built Respite Centres. In the past 12 months we have adapted our fundraising to accommodate Covid restrictions. Events included Launch party in Plymouth (just got in before lockdown) & sponsored walk. Many Activities were moved to online including - Raffles, Bingo, Quiz's & Selling donated items on our on line shop.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 23 June 2020: CIO registration
- HD LIVIN’ (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony Lomas | Chair | 02 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard Gregory James Woods | Trustee | 05 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Miles Monaghan | Trustee | 02 March 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.00k | £35.25k | £21.59k | £41.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.49k | £11.54k | £11.78k | £16.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 November 2024 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 14 November 2024 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 23 Jun 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY:-- (1) PROVIDING RELIEF FOR FULL TIME CARERS ACROSS ENGLAND, THROUGH DELIVERING TEMPORARY INSTITUTIONAL CARE FOR (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY FOR) PEOPLE WHO SUFFER FROM HUNTINGTONÆS DISEASE OR JUVENILE HUNTINGTONÆS DISEASE (PEOPLE SUFFERING FROM OTHER ILLNESSES THAT REQUIRE FULL TIME CARE CAN BE CATERED FOR IF SPACE IS AVAILABLE); AND (2) TO PROVIDE SAFE AN ENJOYABLE MEETING PLACES ACROSS ENGLAND WHERE ANYONE IMPACTED BY HUNTINGTONÆS DISEASE OR JUVENILE HUNTINGTONÆS DISEASE (SUFFERERS, FAMILIES, FRIENDS AND CARERS) CAN GO TO SUPPORT EACH OTHER AND GET PROFESSIONAL ADVICE THROUGH IN PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY DROP IN SESSIONS, COFFEE MORNINGS AND OTHER SOCIAL EVENTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Oakdene Rise
PLYMOUTH
PL9 8RU
- Phone:
- 07813028670
- Email:
- theteam@hdlivin.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window