SHALFORD VILLAGE HALL (SURREY)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity exists to provide a village hall and other facilities for the use of the inhabitants of Shalford and the neighbourhood for meetings, educational purposes and other forms of leisure time occupation, including sports, arts, culture and community development.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £400 from 4 government contract(s) and £400 from 1 government grant(s)
People

20 Trustee(s)
17 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Surrey
Governance
- 27 July 2020: CIO registration
- 17 May 2021: Funds received from 305119 SHALFORD VILLAGE HALL (SURREY)
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
20 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lesley Davies | Chair | 23 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Heidi Monson | Trustee | 04 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dot Crocombe | Trustee | 04 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Stovell | Trustee | 04 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Anne Stokoe | Trustee | 15 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan O'Dell | Trustee | 15 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
William Stokoe | Trustee | 15 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Maura Syed | Trustee | 02 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mary Phillips | Trustee | 15 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ferenc Ago | Trustee | 12 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Claire Townsend | Trustee | 12 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julia Colley Brough | Trustee | 12 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Hastings-Rose | Trustee | 12 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Charles Meade-King | Trustee | 12 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Brian Hawtin | Trustee | 23 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Semple | Trustee | 23 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anne Cooper | Trustee | 23 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
JOHN TREVAIL | Trustee | 23 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alan Midgley | Trustee | 23 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Bowman | Trustee | 26 August 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.31k | £87.63k | £90.23k | £104.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £47.28k | £68.96k | £136.32k | £93.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £400 | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.19k | £24.03k | £11.37k | £400 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 07 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 27 Jul 2020 as amended on 27 Nov 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO OPERATE A VILLAGE HALL KNOWN AS SHALFORD VILLAGE SITUATED AT SHALFORD IN THE COUNTY OF SURREY WITH LAND REGISTRATION NUMBERS SY294371 AND SY553364 FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF SHALFORD AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, AND IN PARTICULAR FOR THE USE OF MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
SHALFORD VILLAGE HALL
KINGS ROAD
SHALFORD
GUILDFORD
GU4 8BQ
- Phone:
- 01483579717
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window