LILIAN PRIME MS CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The LPMSC are here to support you and your loved ones. Understanding that MS and other neurological conditions affect each of us differently, helps to build strong connections with each other. At the centre, we want every visitor, carer and volunteer to feel good, so that we can progress towards a brighter future for all.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 11 September 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Phil Milton | Chair | 08 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adam Prime | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hayley Prime | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Savage | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Donald Prime | Trustee | 12 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alan Jeffels | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Litherland | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.77k | £18.31k | £57.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £628 | £15.73k | £42.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 January 2025 | 90 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 January 2025 | 90 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 October 2023 | 351 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 October 2023 | 351 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 11 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
TO SUPPORT AND RELIEVE PEOPLE AFFECTED BY MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS OR ANY SIMILAR NEUROLOGICAL CONDITION AND TO ENCOURAGE PEOPLE AFFECTED BY MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS OR ANY SIMILAR NEUROLOGICAL CONDITION TO ATTAIN THEIR FULL POTENTIAL AS MEMBERS OF SOCIETY BY IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE BY THE PROVISION OF CARE, SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES FOR INDIVIDUALS AND FAMILIES AND FRIENDS OF INDIVIDUALS WHO ARE AFFECTED BY MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS OR ANY SIMILAR NEUROLOGICAL CONDITION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
LILIAN PRIME MS CENTRE
7 ENTERPRISE WAY
JUBILEE BUSINESS PARK
DERBY
DE21 4BB
- Phone:
- 01332611810
- Email:
- derby@mssociety.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window