FRIENDS OF PRIESTFIELD ARBORETUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We protect, preserve and enhance the collection of rare and interesting specimen trees at the privately owned Priestfield Arboretum, Stony Lane, Little Kingshill, Bucks replacing and adding to them as appropriate.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 07 September 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Timothy Lloyd Pye | Chair | 07 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Jane Murray-Leslie | Trustee | 07 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mary Theresa Wyatt | Trustee | 07 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paul Anthony Heath | Trustee | 07 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.34k | £1.32k | £1.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £380 | £606 | £1.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 04 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 04 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 18 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 18 May 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 07 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROTECT, PRESERVE AND ENHANCE THE COLLECTION OF RARE AND INTERESTING SPECIMEN TREES AT THE PRIVATELY OWNED PRIESTFIELD ARBORETUM, STONY LANE, LITTLE KINGSHILL, BUCKS REPLACING AND ADDING TO THEM AS APPROPRIATE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
DIL KUSHI
WINDSOR LANE
GREAT MISSENDEN
HP16 0DP
- Phone:
- 07768337619
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window