WATTSVILLE COMMUNITY GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Management of a community building, Wattsville Clubhouse.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Total income includes £20,799 from 5 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Caerphilly
Governance
- 27 May 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Wayne Brinkley | Chair | 31 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rebecca Roberts | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Elizabeth Beach | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £121.77k | £138.17k | £72.50k | £83.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £114.28k | £139.53k | £84.86k | £63.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £23.64k | £6.79k | £3.83k | £20.80k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 11 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 11 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 28 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 28 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 05 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 05 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 13 January 2023 | 227 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 13 January 2023 | 227 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 27 May 2020
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF WATTSVILLE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 MILL STREET
CWMFELINFACH
YNYSDDU
NEWPORT
NP11 7HH
- Phone:
- 07545464902
- Email:
- waynebrinkley@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window