DOGBUS - TRANSPORTING PAWS, SAVING LIVES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
No longer an active charity
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Coventry City
Governance
- 20 October 2021: CIO registration
- 19 October 2023: Removed (Removed by application)
- 19 October 2023: Funds transferred to 1139999 RUSHTON DOG RESCUE
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 20 April 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 20 April 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 20 April 2022 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 20 April 2022 |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF ANIMALS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION, IN THE UK AND EUROPE, AND, IN PARTICULAR, TO PROVIDE AND: MAINTAIN RESCUE HOMES OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUCH ANIMALS AND: PROVIDE SAFE AND HUMANE TRANSPORT FOR RESCUED ANIMALS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window