THE MCCARTHY-DIXON FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The McCarthy-Dixon Foundation is a charity for the community and beyond, to help those who are vulnerable and need support. This ranges from individual food parcels to doorstep visits and phone calls, teaching people to cook on a budget, renovating spaces to improve mental well-being, affordable hair cuts, running social clubs & events and supplying local schools with hampers and breakfast boxes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £59,785 from 6 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
Governance
- 06 July 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Graham Trotter | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Thomas Donnelly | Trustee | 22 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Margaret Law | Trustee | 22 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Marie Lally | Trustee | 22 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline O'Connell | Trustee | 22 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Thomas Summers | Trustee | 22 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mabule Sekanaisha Caswel Tema | Trustee | 15 April 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £88.62k | £108.64k | £104.51k | £231.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £83.99k | £80.78k | £122.40k | £175.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.00k | £15.81k | £33.13k | £59.79k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 February 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 01 February 2024 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Jul 2020
Charitable objects
PRINCIPALLY FOR THOSE LIVING IN NORTHAMPTONSHIRE: A) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY AND B) THE RELIEF OF NEED BY REASON OF ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP BY PROVIDING SERVICES, ACTIVITIES, SHELTER, FACILITIES, PERSONAL AND MATERIAL RESOURCES, FOOD AND OTHER PROVISION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The McCarthy-Dixon Foundation
67 GROVE ROAD
NORTHAMPTON
NN1 3LJ
- Phone:
- 07709497036
- Email:
- teresa@mccarthydixon.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window