HARTLEPOOL CIVIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 516156
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To stimulate public interest. To promote high standards of planning & architecture. To secure the preservation, protection, development and improvement of features of historic interest. To protect and improve the environment.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £5
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Hartlepool

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 July 1985: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
BRIAN ROBERT WALKER Chair
GREATHAM COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION LIMITED
Received: On time
Olwyn Hart Trustee 16 August 2023
None on record
Robert Hirst Trustee 10 May 2023
None on record
Frances Wilson Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
Jacqueline Armstrong Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
FRANCES JOHNSON Trustee 01 June 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £271 £0 £0 £0 £5
Total expenditure £121 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 24 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 29 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 28 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 04 December 2021 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 09 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Rannerdale
Cresswell Road
HARTLEPOOL
TS26 0EG
Phone:
07967467563
Website:

No information available