THE STOCKPORT SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Presenting a series of concerts in Stockport Town Hall and performing elsewhere by invitation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Stockport
Governance
- 12 March 1985: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Lesley Anne Selby | Chair | 04 December 2014 |
|
|||||
Joanna Kane | Trustee | 01 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jane Elizabeth Haigh | Trustee | 10 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Jo Hossle-Standring | Trustee | 10 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Craig Eastwood | Trustee | 27 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
DAVID DAVIDSON LUND | Trustee | 03 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
LEONORA ROSE JOHNSTON | Trustee | 03 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr DAVID ROBIN MARTIN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.24k | £10.49k | £33.97k | £44.89k | £47.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.32k | £25.88k | £12.06k | £41.93k | £36.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 04 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 04 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 28 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 28 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 12 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 12 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 16 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 12 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 12 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13/01/1985 AS AMENDED ON 14/06/2011 AS AMENDED ON 01 JUN 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY SHALL BE: A) TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY ANY MEANS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS; B) TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL THINK FIT BUT IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE MAKING OF GRANTS AND DONATIONS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
26 Andrew Street
Mossley
ASHTON-UNDER-LYNE
OL5 0DN
- Phone:
- 01457835656
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window