THE REDDITCH LOCAL HISTORY MUSEUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's aims are to establish a physical Redditch Local History Museum to store, document, present, publish and display historic artefacts and information in a manner that enables people of all ages and abilities to see, experience and learn about the history and heritage of Redditch.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 07 September 2020: CIO registration
- RLHM (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Malcolm Paul Hicks | Chair | 21 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
JUNE STRONG | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
PETER CHARLES BROUGH | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
MARTYN CURRY | Trustee | 03 June 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.50k | £40.43k | £18.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £62 | £8.16k | £12.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £3.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 101 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 101 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 February 2025 | 390 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 February 2025 | 390 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 February 2023 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 February 2023 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 07 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO FORM AND MANAGE MUSEUM FACILITIES WHICH RECORD, DISPLAY AND PROMOTE THE HISTORY AND HERITAGE OF THE TOWN OF REDDITCH AND THE SURROUNDING AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 Market Place
Church Green
REDDITCH
Worcestershire
B98 8AA
- Phone:
- 01527390745
- Email:
- contact@rlhm.online
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window