WYE BUILDING PRESERVATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promote for the benefit of the public the preservation of buildings around Wye in Kent
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kent
Governance
- 18 November 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor John Walter Mansfield BSc PhD | Chair | 18 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Richard Timms | Trustee | 22 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN MARY POWELL | Trustee | 18 November 2020 |
|
|||||
ALAN CARRUTHERS PATERSON | Trustee | 18 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Rosemary Anne Fletcher BSc | Trustee | 18 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Lee Edward Prosser BA PhD FSA | Trustee | 18 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Antony Charles Shoults MA Cantab | Trustee | 18 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | 30/11/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.00k | £2.30k | £4 | £4 | |
|
Total expenditure | £896 | £79 | £381 | £134 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2024 | 14 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2024 | 14 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 18 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 02 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 02 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS ARE TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF ANY BUILDING THAT MAY EXIST IN AND AROUND WYE IN KENT OF SUFFICIENT HISTORICAL, ARCHITECTURAL OR CONSTRUCTIONAL MERIT AND INTEREST.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 UPPER BRIDGE STREET
WYE
ASHFORD
TN25 5AF
- Phone:
- 01233812220
- Email:
- gilbert.holbourn@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window