SUSSEX BOWLING CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Sussex Bowling Club promotes the sport of Greens Bowling. We operate this outdoor activity from April to September at our bowling greens at Sussex Recreation Ground, Brereton Avenue, Cleethorpes, North East Lincolnshire , DN35 8AB. We are a totally inclusive club and open to all of our community. Our Club provides free bowling and bowling tuition to all interested members of the public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- North East Lincolnshire
Governance
- 21 May 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Leam | Chair | 19 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Guy Barfoot | Trustee | 23 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher David Thompson | Trustee | 23 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jean Margaret Wales | Trustee | 10 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
William Ronald Clifford | Trustee | 19 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Alexandra Wheatley | Trustee | 19 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Cook | Trustee | 21 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Steven Artingstall | Trustee | 21 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Edmondson | Trustee | 21 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Peter MARTIN | Trustee | 21 May 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.21k | £8.14k | £58.71k | £19.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.89k | £6.96k | £53.04k | £19.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 19 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 25 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 29 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 05 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 12 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 11 July 2023 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 26 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 26 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 21 May 2020
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN CLEETHORPES AND SURROUNDING AREAS IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF FLAT GREEN BOWLS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
36 SAMUEL AVENUE
GRIMSBY
DN32 8ET
- Phone:
- 01472314110
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window