THE OPEN PRIVATE SCHOOL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We curate 1v1 mentoring programs, matching sixth-form students with experienced professionals at the top of their game. We also run one-off educational events for our mentees. These training sessions include; how to interview well, how to choose a career path and an introduction to finance.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2022
People

4 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 22 June 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Vincent Egunlae | Chair | 24 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Maile | Trustee | 11 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Harry Little | Trustee | 24 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
JAMES ANTHONY RUBIN | Trustee | 24 May 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.50k | £286 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.71k | £2.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 17 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 17 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 382 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 382 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 22 August 2023 | 114 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 22 August 2023 | 114 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 16 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 16 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 22 Jun 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE PROVISION OF CAREER MENTORING AND PROFESSIONAL NETWORKING FOR STATE EDUCATED INDIVIDUALS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AGED 16 AND ABOVE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
32A Lucerne Road
LONDON
N5 1TZ
- Phone:
- +447950697240
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window