Accounts and annual returns British Society for Medical Mycology

Charity number: 1190926
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 08 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 08 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 21 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 21 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 20 August 2022 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 20 August 2022 51 days late Download Open in new window