CHRISTMAS FOR CAMHS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Christmas For CAMHS provides special Christmas gifts every year for children and young people who are inpatients in child and adolescent mental health (CAMHS) wards across the UK over the Christmas holiday period. To help inpatients over the festive season feel thought-about, special and included, our individual gifts are for each young person to keep, as well as activity gifts for each ward.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 10 July 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Naomi Marlene Ghafoor | Trustee | 14 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Charli Beth Clement | Trustee | 14 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Yvette Marion Caster | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matthew David Thomas Glanville | Trustee | 06 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rosanna Sian Bevan | Trustee | 06 December 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.88k | £18.04k | £18.31k | £10.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.74k | £14.06k | £15.51k | £14.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 March 2024 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 March 2024 | 43 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 10 Jul 2020
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE CHARITABLE NEEDS OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE BEING TREATED AT CHILD AND ADOLESCENT MENTAL HEALTH UNITS THROUGHOUT THE UK BY SUPPLYING GIFTS TO THESE UNITS AT CHRISTMAS TIME AND RAISING AWARENESS OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 CHARLCOMBE VIEW ROAD
BATH
BA1 6JY
- Phone:
- 07990578660
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window