THE PIXEL FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE PIXEL FUND PROVIDES GRANTS TO OTHER CHARITIES BASED AND OPERATING IN THE UK INVOLVED IN THE MENTAL HEALTH AND WELL-BEING OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG ADULTS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 27 August 2020: CIO registration
- 30 March 2021: Funds received from 1139878 THE PIXEL FUND
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Neil Debnam | Trustee | 03 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Yvonne Thomson | Trustee | 27 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
KATHERINE JOANNE FERRIE | Trustee | 27 July 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £211.74k | £210.25k | £213.01k | £220.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £113.23k | £171.24k | £148.67k | £137.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 27 Aug 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE 1.1. TO PROMOTE OR ADVANCE ANY PURPOSE WHICH IS CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY THE PAYMENT OF GRANTS, LOANS AND OTHER PAYMENTS TO SUCH CHARITY OR CHARITIES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Southlands Road
BROMLEY
BR2 9QR
- Phone:
- 07756 629 245
- Email:
- admin@pixelfund.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window