Trustees NETTLESTONE AND SEAVIEW SHED

Charity number: 1189878
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Robert Webb Chair 21 May 2020
None on record
Patric Maude Trustee 26 April 2023
None on record
Robert Marshall Trustee 06 October 2022
None on record
Geoff Howells Trustee 04 October 2021
None on record
Graham Bridger Trustee 21 January 2021
None on record
Lynn Stack Trustee 21 May 2020
None on record