SPRINGBOARD YOUTH ACADEMY CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Springboard supports newly arrived refugee & asylum-seeking young people to thrive in the classroom and beyond, through holistic half-term, summer and Saturday education programmes that bridge the gaps in the mainstream education system. Our programmes provide a vital opportunity for young people to make friends, acquire English language and life skills and begin to rebuild their lives in the UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
Total income includes £5,852 from 4 government contract(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 28 August 2020: CIO registration
- SPRINGBOARD YOUTH ACADEMY CIC (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emily Huballah | Chair | 04 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Merel Eusman | Trustee | 08 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Keisha Louise Simms | Trustee | 04 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elaha Walizadeh | Trustee | 04 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tania Khojasteh | Trustee | 09 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Daniella Airapetjana | Trustee | 09 August 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.31k | £41.58k | £86.63k | £113.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.70k | £52.51k | £61.01k | £76.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £7.28k | £5.85k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £2.96k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 28 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 28 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 28 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 28 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 28 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 28 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 15 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 15 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 28 Aug 2020
Charitable objects
TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE WHO ARE MIGRANTS, REFUGEES OR ASYLUM SEEKERS UP TO THE AGE OF 21 LIVING IN LONDON AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF: (A) ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION; (C) PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Suite 3 Wenzel House
Olds Approach
Tolpits Lane
Watford
WD18 9AB
- Phone:
- 07414689137
- Email:
- info@springboardyouth.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window