FFCC LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We work with partners and communities across the UK to encourage debate, catalyse change, and devise practical actions that contribute to: healthy food for everyone provided through a fair system; a transition to agroecology by 2030; and flourishing rural communities with sustainable land use, nature restoration, good work and affordable homes
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£2,271,830
Donations and legacies | £5.00k | |
Charitable activities | £2.27m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,639,618
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £1.64m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £10,973 from 1 government contract(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.64m | |
Retained for future use | £632.21k |
People

16 Employee(s)
8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£80k to £90k | 1 |
One or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 10 September 2021: Standard registration
- FOOD, FARMING AND COUNTRYSIDE COMMISSION (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAME FIONA REYNOLDS DBE | Chair | 17 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ufuk Ibrahim | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Jacquelyn AUSTWICK | Trustee | 17 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Carwyn Howell Jones | Trustee | 17 February 2021 |
|
|||||
Dr Margaret Mayne | Trustee | 20 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Fursdon | Trustee | 17 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Helen Browning | Trustee | 17 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Shirley Cramer CBE | Trustee | 16 April 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £390.72k | £2.12m | £2.27m | |
|
Total expenditure | £983.38k | £1.35m | £1.64m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £10.97k | |
|
Income from government grants | £44.78k | £226.67k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £2.12m | £5.00k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | £2.27m | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £1.35m | £1.64m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £1.99k | £15.42k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | £0 | £769 | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | £2.08m | £2.75m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | £196.63k | £227.78k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17 APR 2020 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 23 AUG 2021
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("OBJECTS") ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO PROMOTING SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, BY THE FOLLOWING MEANS: (1) THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE LAND USE, IN PARTICULAR THROUGH AGROECOLOGY; (2) THE PROMOTION OF THE PRUDENT USE OF NATURAL RESOURCES THROUGH SUSTAINABLE FOOD PRODUCTION AND FARMING PRACTICES; (3) THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE MEANS OF ACHIEVING ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND REGENERATION. IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE THE CHARITY WILL PROVIDE FUNDING, MAKE GRANTS OR MAKE FINANCIAL OR OTHER AWARDS IN KIND TO INDIVIDUALS, ORGANISATIONS AND COMMUNITY GROUPS. THE CHARITY WILL USE THE FOLLOWING DEFINITION OF “SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT” AS SET OUT IN THE 1987 BRUNTLAND COMMISSION REPORT: SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT MEANS “DEVELOPMENT THAT MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Courtenay House
Pynes Hill
EXETER
EX2 5AZ
- Phone:
- 02071181870
- Email:
- hello@ffcc.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window