TAKE OFF

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Take Off supports people suffering or recovering from mental health problems by organising support groups, encouraging and arranging activities that promote socialisation and rehabilitation, and providing employment. NB: This CIO is essentially the continuation of the charity of the same name (charity no. 1069836) which was formed in 2015. Further information can found on www.takeoffworks.org
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 20 October 2020: CIO registration
- 15 April 2024: Funds received from 1069836 TAKE OFF
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Clifford Raymond Forrester | Chair | 11 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Mary Tootell | Trustee | 25 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Esther Joy Nevell | Trustee | 05 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Cowell | Trustee | 04 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ian Firth-Clark | Trustee | 04 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Plume | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £228.20k | £235.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £289.22k | £181.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £99.50k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 February 2024 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 07 February 2024 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 February 2023 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 February 2023 | 10 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 20 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT GOOD MENTAL AND PHYSICAL HEALTH OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM MENTAL HEALTH PROBLEMS WHO ARE CLIENTS OR EMPLOYEES OF THE CIO BY PROMOTING POSITIVE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL WELLBEING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
34 Military Road
CANTERBURY
CT1 1LT
- Phone:
- 01227788211
- Email:
- info@takeoffworks.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window